IL SB0337 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning background investigations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GUN DEALER LICENSING-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-003-000
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-23HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-23HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-21HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-21HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-21HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. John Connor
2018-05-21HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. John Connor
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-16HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-16HouseArrived in House
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 035-018-002
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Harmon
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Harmon
2018-05-16SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-003-000
2018-05-15SenateCo-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-09SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon
2018-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-005-000
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2018-02-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018
2018-02-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225104.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback