IL SB0336 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Party Line Emergency Act. Makes a technical change concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CANNABIS-MEDICAL CONDITIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon
2018-02-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2018-02-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-001-000
2018-02-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-001-000
2018-02-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-01-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2018-01-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-01-25SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2018-01-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-01-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 30, 2018
2018-01-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220660.01Amended CodeCitation Text
7206600.01Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback