IL SB0335 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Telegraph Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGISTERED INTERIOR DESIGNERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-001-000
2018-05-16HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-05-16HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-000-000
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-09HouseTo Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-19HouseArrived in House
2018-04-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-003-000
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2018-02-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-001-000
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-02-14SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-12-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-11-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-11-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-10-26SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2017-10-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-10-18SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220550.01Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback