IL SB0335 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0920
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0920
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Telegraph Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REGISTERED INTERIOR DESIGNERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0920 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date August 17, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-008-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-001-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-05-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-05-09 | House | To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-003-000 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-001-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-12-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 55 | 0.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |