IL SB0333 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that the language applies to sexual assault survivors age 13 or older (rather than all sexual assault survivors). In the new procedures for a medical facility, physician, or nurse to report a sexual assault when the sexual assault survivor requests treatment at the medical facility, provides that the procedures are an exception to the other requirements of the existing provisions. In the procedure regarding notification of law enforcement of a sexual assault survivor, provides that the health care provider must advise the survivor about the options for timing of the law enforcement notification, ask the survivor if the survivor has been threatened, and offer to connect the survivor with a rape crisis center for safety planning, if appropriate, and provides that the documentation required to show a survivor's decision regarding notification of law enforcement must include confirmation that the health care provider asked the survivor if the survivor has been threatened. Moves language stating that the provisions do not change the obligations of mandated reporters under specified Acts. Provides that nothing in the provisions require a delay in notification of law enforcement by the Department of Children and Family Services, Adult Protective Services, or any other agency receiving a mandated report.
Title
ASSAULT SURVIVOR REPORTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2023-05-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-12 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-05-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-12 | House | First Reading |
2023-05-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-05-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-022-000 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Koehler |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Koehler |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 006-003-000 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 007-003-000 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 007-003-000 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 3.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |