IL SB0322 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0038
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Credit Union Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the fiscal year of credit unions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR SALE-LICENSE-LOCATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0038
2017-08-04SenateEffective Date August 4, 2017
2017-08-04SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-011-000
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-18HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-12HouseArrived in House
2017-05-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter
2017-05-12SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-05-08SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2053056Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback