IL SB0317 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Specifies that other units of local government (rather than park districts, forest preserve districts, and conservation districts) are added to the list of not-for-profit organizations, local promotion groups, and for-profit businesses that are eligible to receive certain tourism grants from the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity. Removes provisions concerning marketing and private sector programs and allocation of appropriations. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ILLINOIS PROMOTION-LOCAL GOVT
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Jackie Haas [R] |
Rep. Tim Ozinga [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0287 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Tourism Committee; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 073-042-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-24 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to Tourism Committee |
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Assigned to Tourism Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-04-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Tourism and Hospitality; 005-003-001 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Tourism and Hospitality |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Tourism and Hospitality |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 665 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 665 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 665 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 665 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 665 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 665 | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |