IL SB0316 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Clinical Laboratory and Blood Bank Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] |
Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Daniel Biss [D] | Sen. Jason Barickman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 25 | 1-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |