IL SB0316 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0206
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0206
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that if an applicant for medical assistance is a resident in a nursing home, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services must notify the nursing home, in writing, of the Department's decision on the application. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-APPLY-NURSING HOME
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0206 | |
2009-08-10 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-10 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-000 | |
2009-04-30 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita | |
2009-04-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-04-29 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham | |
2009-04-29 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-04-28 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-04-28 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-04-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 2, 2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne | |
2009-03-31 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Consumer Protection; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Consumer Protection | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-03-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-03-20 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2009-03-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby | |
2009-03-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado | |
2009-03-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-03-19 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-03-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-03-19 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Rutherford | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass as Amended Consumer Protection; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Consumer Protection | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Consumer Protection | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |