IL SB0311 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. In provisions concerning the renewable portfolio standards, specifies the goals for procurement of renewable energy credits and cost-effective renewable energy resources that shall be included in the long-term renewable resources procurement plan and makes other changes concerning these procurements and provides for the calculation of the cost of equity for the purposes of recovering all reasonable and prudently incurred costs of energy efficiency measures from retail customers. Provides that savings of fuels other than electricity achieved by measures that educate about, incentivize, encourage, or otherwise support the use of electricity to power vehicles shall count towards the applicable annual incremental goal and shall not be included in determining certain limits. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that an electric utility that serves less than 3,000,000 retail customers but more than 500,000 customers in this State may plan for, construct, install, control, own, manage, or operate photovoltaic electricity production facilities and any energy storage facilities that are planned for, constructed, installed, controlled, owned, managed, or operated in connection with photovoltaic electricity production facilities without obtaining a certificate of public convenience and necessity subject to specified terms and conditions. Provides that a public utility that provided electric service to at least 1,000,000 retail customers in Illinois and gas service to at least 500,000 retail customers in Illinois may elect to recover its natural gas delivery services costs through a performance-based rate. Provides that, beginning in 2022, without obtaining any approvals from the Commission or any other agency, regardless of whether any such approval would otherwise be required, a participating utility that is a combination utility shall pay $1,000,000 per year for 10 years to the energy low-income and support program. Adds provisions authorizing certain utilities to plan for, construct, install, control, own, manage, or operate electric vehicle charging infrastructure. Amends the Prevailing Wage Act to include specified facilities financed in whole or in part with renewable energy resources in the definition of "public works". Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
RENEWABLE ENERGY-VEHICLES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-128A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 5-117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 8-103B | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 8-218 | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 9-244.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=311&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0311.htm |