IL SB0309 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Health Maintenance Organization Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning deposits with the Director of Insurance.
Title
FACILITIES-TELEVISION-CAPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1160 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Effective Date June 1, 2019 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-11-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 27, 2018 |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-11-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-001-000 |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-11-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-11-12 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-05-16 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2017-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-15 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-05-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Haine |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2017 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 125 | 2-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |