IL SB0309 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Health Maintenance Organization Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning deposits with the Director of Insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FACILITIES-TELEVISION-CAPTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 005-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-05-16HouseAssigned to Special Needs Services
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-15HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-11HouseArrived in House
2017-05-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Haine
2017-05-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
2017-03-07SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-07SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2151252-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback