IL SB0302 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-9)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0985
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-9)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0985
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum Act. Provides that the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum Act, to the extent that there is a conflict between the provisions of Executive Order 2017-1 and the Act, supersedes the Executive Order, and shall be controlling. Provides that the Governor in consultation with the Board of Trustees of the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum and the Illinois Historical Society shall appoint the Illinois State Historian (currently, appointed by the Executive Director of the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum). Provides for qualifications and term requirements of the Illinois State Historian. Transfers previously held duties and requirements of the State Historian under the Act to the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum and its Executive Director. Removes provision requiring the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum and the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library Foundation to mutually cooperate to establish a working group for specified purposes. Removes provision allowing the Executive Director of the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum to have hiring and appointing power over specified personnel. Repeals the State Historical Library Act. Repeals the Illinois Sesquicentennial of the American Civil War Commission Act. Makes conforming changes.
Title
LINCOLN LIBRARY-ST HISTORIAN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0985 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-04 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000 |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2022-01-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2022-01-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2022-01-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-12-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-12-14 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-12-08 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-12-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-12-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-11-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-11-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-11-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-10-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-29 | House | First Reading |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-10-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2021-10-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-001 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 28, 2021 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 015-000-000 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3425 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3475 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3475 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3475 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3475 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3475 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3475 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5030 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 160 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 160 | 22a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 205 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |