IL SB0298 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
CONSUMER FRAUD-PRICES-SERVICES
Sponsors
Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Tom Rooney [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0207 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-008-000 |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-002-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bush |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 5 | 1.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |