IL SB0293 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Online Child Safety Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABUSE/NEGLECT-UNFOUNDED REPORT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
2018-04-12SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-03-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
325651Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback