IL SB0293 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Renewable Fuels Development Program Act. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to establish and administer the Illinois Corn Grain to Fuel Research Consortium Assistance Program. Sets forth the purposes and conditions for the grant program. Sets forth the amounts of the grants. Specifies how these grant funds shall be allocated. Sets forth certain limitations on spending on the various Program grants. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Renewable Fuels Development Program Fund as a special fund in the State treasury to fund these grant programs. Sets forth certain conditions for the operation of this Fund. Provides for certain annual payments from the General Revenue Fund to the Renewable Fuels Development Program Fund. Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Exempts from taxation under the Acts, that part of the selling price of motor fuel or gasohol that exceeds $2.50 per gallon. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RENEWABLE FUELS PROGRAMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-15 Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
2009-08-15 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2009-04-02 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady
2009-03-31 Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Agriculture and Conservation
2009-03-30 Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation
2009-03-25 Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2009-03-25 Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland
2009-03-11 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009
2009-03-11 Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 010-000-000
2009-03-06 Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs
2009-03-04 Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation
2009-02-20 Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2009-02-06 Referred to Assignments
2009-02-06 First Reading
2009-02-06 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback