IL SB0280 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Enrolled on October 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Regional Water Commissions Division of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the corporate authorities of several municipalities may create a regional water commission to purchase or construct a waterworks system or a common source of supply of water, or both, and may operate jointly a waterworks system or a common source of supply of water, or both, and improve and extend the same. Provides that the forming municipalities must include at least one municipality with at least 140,000 inhabitants that is located in whole or in part in the county of Cook, DuPage, Kane, Kendall, Lake, McHenry, or Will, excluding municipalities of greater than 500,000 inhabitants. Includes provisions establishing the commission and the board of commissioners, costs and funding of the commission, powers of the board and commission, revenue bonds, rates and charges for waterworks systems and water source of supply, and property acquisition. Amends the Eminent Domain Act making a conforming change. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI REGIONAL WATER COMMISSION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24SenateSent to the Governor
2021-10-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-10-28SenateSenate Concurs
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 3/5 Vote Required
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 3/5 Vote Required
2021-10-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2021-10-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 3/5 Vote Required
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-10-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John Connor
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-10-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John Connor
2021-10-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-10-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John Connor
2021-10-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - October 28, 2021
2021-10-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
2021-10-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001
2021-10-28House3/5 Vote Required
2021-10-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2021-10-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2021-10-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-10-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-10-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2021-10-28HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-10-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-10-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-10-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-10-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 025-000-000
2021-10-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-10-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2021-10-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
2021-10-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-10-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
2021-10-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2021-10-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
2021-10-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-10-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-10-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2021-10-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2021-10-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2021-10-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John Connor
2021-10-27HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2021-10-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-10-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2021-10-26HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-10-26HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2021-10-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-06-02HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
2021-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-006-000
2021-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2021-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
2021-05-13HouseCommittee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2021
2021-03-05SenateDo Pass Revenue; 011-000-000
2021-02-24SenateAssigned to Revenue
2021-02-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-19SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-19SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-74.4-3.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=280&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0280.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0280eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0280enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0280ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0280ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0280ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0280_04212021_069018.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB0280_10282021_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0280ham003_10282021_009002C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0280ham002_10282021_009001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0280ham001_10282021_009000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback