IL SB0275 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois AgrAbility Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LAW ENFORCE GANG DATABASE INFO
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 030-019-001 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Van Pelt |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Van Pelt |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-006-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 235 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |