IL SB0274 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Uniform Racial Classification Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MAHOMET AQUIFER PROTECTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-07-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)
2018-05-24SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Environment and Conservation
2018-05-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 019-000-000
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Environment
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bennett
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-03-22SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20501Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback