IL SB0273 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Revenue Sharing Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-09HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2016-06-30HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
2016-05-23HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2016-05-23HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
2016-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-05-23HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2016-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-01-29HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
2015-12-04HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
2015-10-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
2015-09-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
2015-08-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015
2015-07-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015
2015-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015
2015-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015
2015-05-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-22HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
2015-05-20HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2015-05-19HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-004-000
2015-05-15HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
2015-05-08HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
2015-03-26HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2015-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-09HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2015-02-05HouseArrived in House
2015-02-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2015-02-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 5, 2015
2015-02-04SenateSecond Reading
2015-02-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 4, 2015
2015-02-03SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2015-02-03SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2015-02-03SenateAssigned to Executive
2015-01-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-01-28SenateFirst Reading
2015-01-28SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301150.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback