IL SB0272 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Employment First Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE FACILITY WATER MANAGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton
2018-04-19SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-001-000
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-02-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-02-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20401Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback