IL SB0266 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Nuclear Safety Law of 2004. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERANS HOME AT CHICAGO

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 007-000-000
2017-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-01HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe
2017-04-27SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
2017-04-05SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Veterans Affairs
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2033101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback