IL SB0265 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Commerce Commission for its FY 20 ordinary and contingent expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$ILLINOIS COMMERCE COMMISSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateDo Pass Appropriations II; 010-000-005
2019-02-27SenateRe-assigned to Appropriations II
2019-02-27SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback