IL SB0258 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0087
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends a Section of the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act regarding health insurance coverage for children. Defines "insurance obligee" as an individual to whom a health insurance obligation is owed on behalf of a child and "insurance obligor" as an individual who has an obligation to provide health insurance for a child. Changes certain terminology in the Section to conform to the new defined terms. Deletes language providing that the court shall enter an order for health insurance coverage of the child upon the request of the obligee or the public office in charge of child support enforcement. Deletes certain requirements concerning the procedures and notice obligations governing an application for insurability following the entry of an order. Deletes language providing that the court shall order the obligor to reimburse the obligee for 50% of the premium for placing the child on his or her health insurance policy under certain circumstances. Deletes language providing that the court may order the obligor to reimburse the obligee for 100% of the premium for placing the child on his or her health insurance policy. Deletes language providing that the obligor shall be liable to the obligee for the dollar amount of the premiums that were not paid. Provides that an employer may eliminate a child from the insurance obligor's health insurance coverage if the employer no longer provides a group health insurance plan to any employees or the child is no longer eligible for coverage due to federal or State restrictions. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMDMA-HEALTH INSURANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0087
2021-07-09SenateEffective Date January 1, 2022
2021-07-09SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-24SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-26SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-26HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000
2021-05-21HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2021-02-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-17SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7505505.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback