IL SB0257 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Hearing: May 19 @ 10:00 am in Virtual Room 3 www.ilga.gov
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Deletes language providing that: all counseling sessions shall be confidential; and communications in counseling shall not be used in any manner in litigation nor relied upon by any expert appointed by the court or retained by any party. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMDMA-COUNSELING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2021-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
2021-05-13HouseCommittee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-03-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2021-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-02-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-02-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-17SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7505607.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback