IL SB0255 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0086
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0086
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mortgage Foreclosure Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that the order confirming the sale of property may approve the mortgagee's fees and costs (i) arising between the entry of the judgment of foreclosure and the confirmation hearing, and (ii) incurred on or after the date of execution of an affidavit stating the amount due and prior to the judgment but not included in the judgment, those costs and fees to be allowable to the same extent as provided in the note and mortgage. Effective immediately.
Title
FORECLOSURE-SALE CONFIRMATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0086 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Effective Date July 9, 2021 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 15-1508 | Amended Code | Citation Text |