IL SB0252 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Creates the Innovation, Automation, and Structural Pilot Program to be implemented and administered by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity. Specifies the purpose of the Program. Provides Program qualification requirements. Provides Program certification requirements. Provides for the adoption of rules. Specifies the duration of the Program. Repeals provisions on January 1, 2029. Effective immediately.
Title
DCEO-INNOVATION PILOT PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-06 | House | To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 14, 2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce; 011-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |