IL SB0250 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the SAFE Act. Provides that on and after January 1, 2020, funding formulas based on population shall include prisoners as residents based on the place where they resided before incarceration or the place they intend to return. Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act. Provides that within 60 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority shall identify geographic areas eligible to be designated by the Safe and Full Coordinating Board as a Safe and Full Employment Zone (SAFE Zone) and shall send to the Legislative Audit Commission and make publicly available its analysis and development of the SAFE Zones. Provides that the criteria for these SAFE Zones shall be used to prioritize State funding and provide various services throughout the State. Creates the Safe and Full Employment Coordinating Board to develop and implement a plan for designating SAFE Zones. Provides that the design of programs and budget requirements in SAFE Zones shall be developed by Local Economic Growth Councils. Amends the State Revenue Sharing Act. Provides that for purposes of the amount of funds allocable to each municipality and county in the State, the number of individual residents of a municipality or county shall include the number of persons incarcerated in a penal institution who resided in the municipality or county before incarceration, or, if known, the municipality or county the prisoner intends to return after release from the penal institution. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the First Time Weapon Offender Program shall be implemented by the Safe and Full Employment Coordinating Board. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFE ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2039307.3New CodeSee Bill Text
2039307.3-2New CodeSee Bill Text
2039307.3-5New CodeSee Bill Text
301152Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-6-3.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback