IL SB0243 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Automated License Plate Recognition System Data Act. Provides that a law enforcement agency may use recorded automated license plate recognition system (ALPR) data and historical ALPR system data only for a legitimate law enforcement purpose. Provides that ALPR system data collected by law enforcement and historical ALPR system data collected by law enforcement may not be used, shared, sold, traded, or exchanged for any other purpose. Requires law enforcement agencies using an automated license plate recognition system to adopt a policy governing use of the system; adopt a privacy policy to ensure that ALPR system data and historical ALPR system data is not used or shared in violation of this Act; adopt audit procedures relating to use of ALPR system data and historical ALPR system data; and adopt and periodically update a comprehensive training program for agency employees who use or have access to ALPR system data and procedures to adhere to policies and procedures governing use of ALPR system data or historical ALPR system data. Provides that a State or local law enforcement agency may retain ALPR system data for 5 years. Provides that after 5 years, the State or local law enforcement agency must create an internal record showing why data older than 5 years was accessed, and attach a case name and number, the name of the officer that accessed the data, the date, and an explanation for why the data was accessed. Prohibits admission of data that is used in violation of the Act in a court or administrative proceeding. Prohibits less restrictive local regulation, including by home rule units. Defines terms. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to exempt ALPR system and historical ALPR system data from disclosure under the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ALPR SYSTEM DATA ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback