IL SB0238 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Charter Schools Law of the School Code. Establishes the Illinois Charter Public School Commission as an independent, State-level, charter school authorizing entity working in collaboration with the State Board of Education. Includes provisions concerning membership, funding, staff, powers and duties, Commission charter school applications, Commission immunity, an annual report to the General Assembly and the State Board, oversight fees, and total pupil enrollment. Provides that every 2 years (instead of annually), the State Board shall compile evaluations of charter schools received from school boards. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-CHARTER PUBLIC SCH COMM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-11 | Held in Education; Subcommittee on Charter Schools | |
2009-03-05 | To Education Subcommittee on Charter Schools | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Education | |
2009-02-06 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Cronin | |
2009-02-06 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=238&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0238.htm |