IL SB0237 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the intent of the Title regarding the site remediation program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFETY-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-02-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415558Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback