IL SB0225 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTIONS-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-15HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-21HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-11-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-10-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-10-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-10-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-10-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-10-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-10-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-10-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-10-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-10-25HouseArrived in House
2017-10-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-10-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-10-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-10-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-10-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-017-000
2017-10-25Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link
2017-10-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-10-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-10-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-004-000
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2017-10-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-10-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-10-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-10-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-10-23SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
2017-10-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-10-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-10-18SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-07-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-07-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback