IL SB0225 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
ELECTIONS-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-21 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-11-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-10-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-10-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-10-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-017-000 |
2017-10-25 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-004-000 |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2017-10-23 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |