IL SB0223 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Professional Services Selection Act. Removes an option allowing a political subdivision not to evaluate firms submitting letters of interest for projects requiring architectural, engineering, or land surveying services if the political subdivision has a satisfactory relationship for services with one or more firms.
Title
LOCAL PROFESSIONAL SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LG) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LG) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 510 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |