IL SB0222 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0597
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice to offer to consumers at retail a rebate made on a rebate card that charges dormancy fees or other post-issuance fees. Defines "rebate card".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GAMBLING-SPORTS WAGERING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-14 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 7 NV: 31 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-06SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0597
2019-12-06SenateEffective Date December 6, 2019
2019-12-06SenateGovernor Approved
2019-12-04SenateSent to the Governor
2019-11-14SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-11-14SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-11-14SenateSenate Concurs
2019-11-14SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 040-000-000
2019-11-14SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 040-000-000
2019-11-14Senate3/5 Vote Required
2019-11-14SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-11-14SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-11-14SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-11-14SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-11-14SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-11-14SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-11-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - November 14, 2019
2019-11-14SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3
2019-11-14HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-007-003
2019-11-14House3/5 Vote Required
2019-11-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2019-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Prevailed to Suspend Rule by Voice Vote
2019-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed to Suspend House Rule(s) for Immediate Consideration Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
2019-11-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-11-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-11-14HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Rita
2019-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-06-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John Connor
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
2019-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-20HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John Connor
2019-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-16HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-16HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-05-15SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-017-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Castro
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 007-003-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2019
2019-03-14SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 008-002-000
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-07SenatePostponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8155052LLLAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=222&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0222.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0222eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0222enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0597.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0222sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0222ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0222ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0222ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0222_04112019_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0222_11142019_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0222ham003_11142019_031001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0222ham001_11142019_031000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback