IL SB0222 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Removes procurement expenditures made by the University of Illinois from the application of the Act and the University of Illinois from the definition of "State agency". Amends the State Property Control Act to remove property of the University of Illinois from the definition of "property" (but still requires the University of Illinois to send usable, surplus equipment to the Department of Central Management Services for transfer or disposal). Amends the University of Illinois Act. Under a University of Illinois Investment, Performance, and Accountability Commitment, requires the State to annually appropriate a minimum specified amount, provided that the University meets certain requirements at its campuses. Provides for an annual report, and repeals the Commitment on June 30, 2022. Provides for the issuance of certificates of participation for capital improvements, to be reviewed by the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability. Requires the maximum annual debt service for the University's total certificate of participation obligation to not exceed $100,000,000. Subject to appropriation, provides for an Illinois Excellence Program to recruit and retain promising faculty throughout the University of Illinois system through capital investment in both new and distressed facilities; amends the State Finance Act to create a special fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNIVERSITY OF IL COMMITMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Higher Education
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Higher Education
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2017-04-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-04-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2017-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2017-03-22SenateRe-assigned to Higher Education
2017-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110305100New CodeSee Bill Text
110305105New CodeSee Bill Text
110305110New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text
305001-10Amended CodeCitation Text
305001-15.100Amended CodeCitation Text
306051.02Amended CodeCitation Text
306057.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback