IL SB0218 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that unless good cause exists that filing a petition to terminate parental rights is contrary to the child's best interests, the Department of Children and Family Services shall request the State's Attorney to file a petition or motion for termination of parental rights and appointment of guardian of the person with power to consent to adoption of the minor under the Act if the parent is criminally convicted of predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, aggravated criminal sexual assault, criminal sexual abuse, sexual exploitation of a child, or permitting sexual abuse of a child. Makes technical changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PARENTAL RIGHT TERMINATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-05-26SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-001
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-003-000
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-02-20SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054052-13Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback