IL SB0211 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Video Gaming Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOTTERY-PRIZE-CONFIDENTIAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 050-007-000
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-001-001
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-009-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-001-000
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-22HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-001-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-005-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Murphy
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Murphy
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 012-001-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy
2018-04-12SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 012-001-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-04-04SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-03-22SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230401Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=211&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0211.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0211eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0211enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0211sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0211sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0211sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0211ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0211_04262018_060000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0211_05292018_023000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0211ham001_05302018_053000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback