IL SB0211 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1068
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1068
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LOTTERY-PRIZE-CONFIDENTIAL
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1068 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date August 24, 2018 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 050-007-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-001-001 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-009-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-25 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-001-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-22 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-001-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-005-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Murphy |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Murphy |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 012-001-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Gaming |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 012-001-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 40 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |