IL SB0209 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pull Tabs and Jar Games Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
VIDEO GAMING ACT-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-06-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-06-21 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2017-06-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-21 | House | First Reading |
2017-06-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-06-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-013-002 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Terry Link |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 012-000-002 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2017 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 20 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |