IL SB0209 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Natural Resources Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-13SenateSession Sine Die
2013-05-02SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013
2013-04-30SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2013-04-29SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013
2013-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013
2013-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2013-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013
2013-03-20SenateDo Pass Executive; 010-000-000
2013-03-13SenateAssigned to Executive
2013-01-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2013-01-23SenateFirst Reading
2013-01-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
208011-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback