IL SB0209 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0612
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code and the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that a person who may be voluntarily admitted to a mental health facility includes a person adjudicated a disabled person. Provides for voluntary admission to a mental health facility if the facility director determines and documents in the recipient's medical record that the person (i) is clinically suitable for admission as a voluntary recipient and (ii) has the capacity to consent to voluntary admission (instead of if the director deems such person clinically suitable for admission as a voluntary recipient). Sets forth factors to be considered in determining whether a person has the capacity to consent to voluntary admission. Provides that a guardian of the person may not admit a ward to a mental health facility except at the ward's request as provided in the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code and unless the ward has the capacity to consent to such admission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MENTL HLTH-VOLUNTARY ADMISSION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-05-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-24 Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0612
2009-08-24 Effective Date January 1, 2010
2009-08-24 Governor Approved
2009-06-25 Sent to the Governor
2009-05-27 Passed Both Houses
2009-05-27 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2009-05-26 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000
2009-05-22 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
2009-05-21 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2009-05-21 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather Steans
2009-05-19 Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 20, 2009
2009-05-19 Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2009-05-19 Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2009-05-12 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2009-05-12 Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-05-06 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2009-05-06 Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Disability Services Committee; 004-000-000
2009-05-06 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Disability Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2009-05-06 House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Disability Services Committee
2009-04-14 Assigned to Disability Services Committee
2009-04-02 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-04-02 First Reading
2009-04-02 Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2009-04-02 Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
2009-04-02 Arrived in House
2009-04-02 Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2009-02-27 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2009
2009-02-27 Second Reading
2009-02-19 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2009
2009-02-19 Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2009-02-10 Assigned to Human Services
2009-02-03 Referred to Assignments
2009-02-03 First Reading
2009-02-03 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback