IL SB0207 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Raffles and Poker Runs Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LOTTERY-STATE POLICE MEMORIALS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-22 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-05-18 | House | To Finance Subcommittee |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-05-03 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 15 | 0.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |