IL SB0197 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Home Heating Relief Act of 2023. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to create, as soon as practicable, a Home Heating Rebate Program to provide rebates to households that use natural gas or propane gas for heating purposes and that have a median household income between 200% and 400% of the poverty guidelines updated periodically in the Federal Register by the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. Provides that eligible households shall receive the rebates as soon as practicable after implementation of the program. Requires the Department to, by rule, establish qualifications for program participation which may include requirements that apply under the Energy Assistance Act and other requirements. Provides that rebates provided under the program shall be funded through appropriations made from the Home Heating Rebate Relief Fund created under the Act. Requires the State Comptroller to direct and the State Treasurer to transfer $500,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Home Heating Rebate Relief Fund to provide rebates to qualifying households for State fiscal years 2023 and 2024. Provides that any funds left over at the end of the second month following implementation of the program may be awarded to certain qualifying first-time small business owners as determined by the Department. Requires the Department to adopt emergency rules in accordance with the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to implement the program. Amends the State Finance Act to include the Home Heating Rebate Relief Fund as a special fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOME HEATING RELIEF ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2024-05-03SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
2024-04-05SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
2024-03-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
2024-01-10SenateRe-assigned to Appropriations
2023-03-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-02-07SenateAssigned to Appropriations
2023-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2023-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.990New CodeSee Bill Text
51005-45.34New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback