IL SB0196 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Township Code. Deletes the requirement that a township board must make a one-time transfer of monies from the township's general assistance fund to the general township fund within one year after July 25, 2002. Provides that a township that has certified a new general assistance levy or an increase in the levy in the previous calendar year (rather than during 2002) may not transfer monies from the general assistance fund. Effective immediately

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TWP CD-GENERAL ASSISTANCE FUND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
2017-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-04-25HouseArrived in House
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 006-000-000
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-02-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-02-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
601235-20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback