IL SB0195 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0475
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0475
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: Amends the Educational Planning Services Consumer Protection Act. Provides that upon the termination of the contract for any reason, the educational planning service provider shall provide a timely and accurate response to any postsecondary institution, agency, or other entity that contacts the provider in reference to the consumer, indicating that the provider no longer represents the consumer. Makes changes to disclosures an education planning service provider must provide in any marketing or advertising communications. Makes changes in provisions concerning purpose and construction; prohibitions and requirements; civil remedies and injunctions; and rules. Provides that the definition of "educational planning service provider" does not include an institution of high learning (rather than a not-for-profit or public institution of higher learning).
Title
PROBATE-GUARDIAN APPOINTMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0475 |
2023-08-04 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-08-04 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2023-05-19 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 10, 2023 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2023-05-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2023-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-04-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2023-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-04-11 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2023-03-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-03-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 8, 2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 16, 2023 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 11-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |