IL SB0194 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a firefighter who previously participated in the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) for service as a member of the fire department of a municipality and was transferred to that municipality's firefighters' pension fund upon its creation, as required under the Downstate Firefighter Article as a result of the federal decennial census of 2010, shall, for the purposes of determining the applicable tier of benefits, be deemed to have become a firefighter and member of that municipality's firefighters' pension fund on the date that he or she first participated in IMRF as a member of the fire department of that municipality, notwithstanding whether that start date was before January 1, 2011. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-IMRF-DNST FIRE-HIRE DATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HousePension Note Filed
2019-05-16HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-05-07HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Dave Severin
2019-05-07HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dave Severin
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-02HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-003-000
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-03-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-20HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-03-20HouseArrived in House
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Government Accountability and Pensions; 010-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Government Accountability and Pensions
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback