IL SB0193 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-16 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance must provide coverage for medically necessary preventative physical therapy for insureds diagnosed with multiple sclerosis without any treatment limitation or calendar year maximum. Removes requirements that coverage under this provision be subject to the same waiting period, cost sharing limitation, treatment limitation, calendar year maximum, or other limitation as provided for other physical or rehabilitative therapy benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-11-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-11-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2017-11-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2017-11-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2017-11-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2017-11-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2017-11-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2017-11-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-11-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-010-000
2017-11-07SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-11-07HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-10-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-10-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
2017-10-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-10-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-08-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2017
2017-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 011-000-000
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2017-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Insurance
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-02-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-02-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-01-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback