IL SB0189 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-15)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that when the victim is under 18 years of age at the time of the offense, a prosecution for criminal sexual assault, aggravated criminal sexual assault, predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, aggravated criminal sexual abuse, or criminal sexual abuse may be commenced at any time regardless as to whether corroborating physical evidence is available or an individual who is required to report an alleged or suspected commission of any of these offenses under the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act fails to do so. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-LIMITATION-SEX OFFENSE

Sponsors

Sen. Scott Bennett [D]Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D]Sen. William Cunningham [D]Sen. Melinda Bush [D]
Sen. Patricia Vanpelt-Watkins [D]Sen. David Koehler [D]Sen. Laura Murphy [D]Sen. Julie Morrison [D]
Sen. Heather Steans [D]Sen. Omar Aquino [D]Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D]Sen. Pat McGuire [D]
Sen. Daniel Biss [D]Sen. Andy Manar [D]Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D]Sen. Steve Stadelman [D]
Sen. Neil Anderson [R]Sen. John Mulroe [D]Sen. Chris Nybo [R]Sen. William McCann [R]
Sen. Pamela Althoff [R]Sen. Mattie Hunter [D]Sen. Michael Connelly [R]Sen. Jil Tracy [R]
Sen. Ira Silverstein [D]Sen. Iris Martinez [D]Sen. Cristina Castro [D]Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D]
Sen. Terry Link [D]Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D]Sen. Michael Hastings [D]Rep. Michelle Mussman [D]
Rep. Linda LaVia [D]Rep. Jehan Gordon [D]Rep. Jerry Costello [D]Rep. Anna Moeller [D]
Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D]Rep. Mary Flowers [D]Rep. Jay Hoffman [D]Rep. Katie Stuart [D]
Rep. Martin Moylan [D]Rep. Margo McDermed [R]Rep. Frances Hurley [D]Rep. Laura Fine [D]
Rep. Grant Wehrli [R]Rep. Deborah Conroy [D]Rep. Sue Scherer [D]Rep. Michael Halpin [D]
Rep. Daniel Beiser [D]Rep. Sam Yingling [D]Rep. Brandon Phelps [D]Rep. David Olsen [R]
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D]Rep. Natalie Manley [D]Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R]Rep. Avery Bourne [R]
Rep. Steven Andersson [R]Rep. Juliana Stratton [D]Rep. John D'Amico [D]Rep. Carol Sente [D]
Rep. Keith Wheeler [R]Rep. Peter Breen [R]Rep. Al Riley [D]Rep. Dave Severin [R]
Rep. Litesa Wallace [D]Rep. Carol Ammons [D]Rep. Sonya Harper [D]Rep. Justin Slaughter [D]
Rep. Marcus Evans [D]Rep. Camille Lilly [D]

Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-05-09HouseRe-assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-04-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-04-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-30HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-03-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-03-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-03-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-29HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-29HouseArrived in House
2017-03-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-01-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72053-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback