IL SB0187 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0056
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0056
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code with respect to administrative certificates. Allows for a chief school business official endorsement if, among other conditions, the certificate holder has 2 years of university-approved practical experience (as an alternative to requiring 2 years of administrative experience in school business management).
Title
SCH CD-CHIEF SCH BUS OFFICIAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-23 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0056 | |
2009-07-23 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-07-23 | Governor Approved | |
2009-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-04-28 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-22 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 020-000-000 | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-25 | First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-25 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-03-06 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2009 | |
2009-02-27 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Education | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-03 | First Reading | |
2009-02-03 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney |